OK HB1314 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Game and fish; repealing prohibition to hunt white deer; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game and fish; repealing prohibition to hunt white deer; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-04 - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-16 Approved by Governor 04/13/2012
2012-04-09 Sent to Governor
2012-04-09 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-04-05 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-04-04 Referred for enrollment
2012-04-04 Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
2012-04-04 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2012-04-04 General Order, Considered
2011-04-07 Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2011-03-14 Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
2011-02-22 First Reading
2011-02-22 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-02-21 Referred for engrossment
2011-02-21 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2011-02-21 Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze
2011-02-21 General Order
2011-02-16 Authored by Senator Coates (principal Senate author)
2011-02-16 Coauthored by Representative(s) Lockhart
2011-02-16 CR; Do Pass Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment
2011-02-07 Authored by Representative Richardson
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
295414Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback