OH SCR8 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-32)
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-04 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-04 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To designate the month of April as Forgotten Victims
Title
To designate the month of April as Forgotten Victims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-04 - House - House - Resolution was adopted (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-04 | Concurrence | |
2013-04-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-04-10 | Committee Report | |
2013-03-05 | To Criminal Justice | |
2013-03-05 | Introduced to House | |
2013-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-05-14 | Committee Report | |
2013-04-16 | To Judiciary | |
2013-04-16 | Introduced to Senate |