OH SCR37 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-10)
Status: Engrossed on November 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-12 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-12 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To encourage hospitals and freestanding birthing
Title
To encourage hospitals and freestanding birthing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-11-12 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-11-12 | Committee Report | |
2014-04-01 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2014-04-01 | Introduced to House | |
2014-12-10 | Committee Report | |
2014-11-13 | To Health and Aging | |
2014-11-13 | Introduced to Senate |