OH SCR36 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing World Elder Abuse Awareness Day in Ohio,
Title
Recognizing World Elder Abuse Awareness Day in Ohio,
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-05-21 | Committee Report | |
2014-03-17 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2014-03-17 | Introduced to House | |
2014-05-29 | To Policy and Legislative Oversight | |
2014-05-29 | Introduced to Senate |