OH SCR27 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-04 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-04 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To declare that the Ohio General Assembly is opposed
Title
To declare that the Ohio General Assembly is opposed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-02-19 | Committee Report | |
2013-11-18 | To Transportation | |
2013-11-18 | Introduced to House | |
2014-12-16 | Committee Report | |
2014-12-04 | To Policy and Legislative Oversight | |
2014-12-04 | Introduced to Senate |