OH SCR23 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring May 12, 2014 "National Fibromyalgia
Title
Declaring May 12, 2014 "National Fibromyalgia
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-01-29 | Committee Report | |
2013-10-15 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2013-10-15 | Introduced to House | |
2014-05-14 | Committee Report | |
2014-02-05 | To Health and Aging | |
2014-02-05 | Introduced to Senate |