OH SCR21 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-15)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-09 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-09 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
As Adopted by the House 130th General AssemblyRegular Session2013-2014S. C. R. No. 21 Senator Hughes
Title
As Adopted by the House 130th General AssemblyRegular Session2013-2014S. C. R. No. 21 Senator Hughes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-09 - House - House - Resolution was adopted (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-09 | Concurrence | |
2014-05-21 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-05-15 | Committee Report | |
2013-09-23 | To State Government Oversight & Reform | |
2013-09-23 | Introduced to House | |
2014-12-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-04 | Committee Report | |
2014-05-22 | To Policy and Legislative Oversight | |
2014-05-22 | Introduced to Senate |