OH SCR10 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 52-17)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To memorialize the Congress of the United States to seek the withdrawal of the United States Preventive Services Task Force recommendation against prostate-specific antigen-based screening for prostate cancer for men in all age groups.
Title
To memorialize the Congress of the United States to seek the withdrawal of the United States Preventive Services Task Force recommendation against prostate-specific antigen-based screening for prostate cancer for men in all age groups.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-29 - House - House - Resolution was adopted (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | Concurrence | |
2013-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-20 | Committee Report | |
2013-03-19 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2013-03-19 | Introduced to House | |
2014-01-29 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-01-09 | Committee Report | |
2013-12-10 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-12-10 | Introduced to Senate |