OH SB99 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1739.05 and 5162.20 and to enact sections 1751.69, 3923.85, and 5164.09 of the Revised Code regarding insurance and Medicaid coverage for orally administered cancer medications.
Title
Regarding insurance and Medicaid coverage for orally administered cancer medications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-17 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-03 | Concurrence | |
2014-03-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-12-05 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-04-09 | To Insurance & Financial Institutions | |
2013-04-09 | Introduced to House | |
2014-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-21 | Committee Report | |
2014-03-13 | To Health and Aging | |
2014-03-13 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 39 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 51 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
39 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 23 | 85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 62 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 62 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 64 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
51 | 64 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |