OH SB98 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1701.07, 1702.06, 1703.041, 1705.06, 1705.54, 1729.06, 1733.06, 1745.13, 1746.04, 1747.03, 1751.03, 1776.07, 1776.86, 1782.04, and 1782.49 of the Revised Code to expand the list of entities that may serve as statutory agents.
Title
To expand the list of entities that may serve as statutory agents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-29 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Effective Date | |
2014-02-18 | Governor' Action | |
2014-02-25 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-02-13 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-01-29 | Concurrence | |
2013-06-27 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-06-19 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-04-09 | To Civil Justice | |
2013-04-09 | Introduced to House | |
2014-01-29 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-11-14 | Committee Report | |
2013-06-27 | To Judiciary | |
2013-06-27 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 01 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 02 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 03 | 041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 05 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 05 | 54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 29 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 33 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 45 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 46 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 46 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 47 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 51 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 76 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 76 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 76 | 86 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 82 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 82 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 82 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text |