OH SB83 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-22)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-22)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3719.06, 4723.28, 4723.481, 4723.482, 4723.492, and 4723.50 of the Revised Code to modify the authority of certain advanced practice nurses to prescribe schedule II controlled substances and to authorize the Board of Nursing to take disciplinary actions for self-administration of schedule I controlled substances.
Title
To modify the authority of certain advanced practice nurses to prescribe schedule II controlled substances and to authorize the Board of Nursing to take disciplinary actions for self-administration of schedule I controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Effective Date | |
2012-03-09 | Governor' Action | |
2012-03-12 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-02-29 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-02-15 | Concurrence | |
2011-06-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-06-23 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-02-16 | To Health, Human Services, & Aging | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced to House | |
2012-02-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-01-25 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-06-28 | To Health & Aging | |
2011-06-28 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 19 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 23 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 23 | 481 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 23 | 482 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 23 | 492 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 23 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |