OH SB82 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 120.521 and to enact section 307.933 of the Revised Code to provide that membership on the board of the Ohio Legal Assistance Foundation by a member of the General Assembly does not constitute holding another public office and to authorize a corrections commission of a multicounty, municipal-county, or multicounty-municipal correctional center to issue securities of the commission to pay the costs associated with certain improvements of the center.
Title
To provide that membership on the board of the Ohio Legal Assistance Foundation by a member of the General Assembly does not constitute holding another public office and to authorize a corrections commission of a multicounty, municipal-county, or multicounty-municipal correctional center to issue securities of the commission to pay the costs associated with certain improvements of the center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Governor' Action | |
2014-04-12 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-04-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-03-25 | Concurrence | |
2013-10-30 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-10-23 | Committee Report | |
2013-03-13 | To Finance | |
2013-03-13 | Introduced to House | |
2014-03-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-01-23 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-10-31 | To Judiciary | |
2013-10-31 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 20 | 521 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
3 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 07 | 933 | New Code | See Bill Text |