OH SB78 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 4740.01, 4740.02, 4740.04, 4740.05, 4740.06, 4740.07, 4740.08, 4740.09, 4740.13, and 4740.16, to enact new section 4740.10 and section 4740.131, and to repeal section 4740.10 of the Revised Code to make changes to the law regulating specialty construction contractors.
Title
To make changes to the law regulating specialty construction contractors.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Dovilla [R] | Rep. Marlene Anielski [R] | Rep. Peter Beck [R] | Sen. Jim Hughes [R] |
Sen. Edna Brown [D] | Sen. Kevin Bacon [R] | Sen. Dave Burke [R] | Sen. John Eklund [R] |
Sen. Lou Gentile [D] | Rep. Thomas Patton [R] | Rep. Bob Peterson [R] | Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D] |
Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-17 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-04-02 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-01-22 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-03-13 | To Commerce & Labor | |
2013-03-13 | Introduced to House | |
2014-06-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-21 | Committee Report | |
2014-04-03 | To Policy and Legislative Oversight | |
2014-04-03 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 40 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 40 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 40 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 40 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 40 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 40 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 40 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 40 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 40 | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
47 | 40 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 40 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |