OH SB77 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-07-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 109.573, 2901.07, 2953.21, 2953.23, 2953.31, 2953.32, 2953.321, 2953.35, 2953.51, 2953.54, 2953.55, 2953.71, 2953.72, 2953.73, 2953.74, 2953.75, 2953.76, 2953.77, 2953.78, 2953.79, 2953.81, 2953.83, and 2953.84, to enact sections 109.561, 2933.81, 2933.82, 2933.83, 2953.56, 2953.57, 2953.58, 2953.59, and 2953.60, and to repeal section 2953.82 of the Revised Code relative to the expansion of DNA testing for certain convicted felons, the elimination of the DNA testing mechanism for felons who pleaded guilty or no contest to the offense, the collection of DNA specimens from all persons eighteen years of age or older who are arrested for a felony offense, the sealing of the official records of persons who have their convictions vacated and set aside due to DNA testing, the preservation and accessibility of biological evidence in a criminal or delinquency investigation or proceeding, the improvement of eyewitness identification procedures, the electronic recording of custodial interrogations, and to provide that DNA records collected in the DNA database and fingerprints filed for record cannot be sealed unless certain circumstances apply.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the expansion of DNA testing for certain convicted felons, the elimination of the DNA testing mechanism for felons who pleaded guilty or no contest to the offense, the collection of DNA specimens from all persons eighteen years of age or older who are arrested for a felony offense, the sealing of the official records of persons who have their convictions vacated and set aside due to DNA testing, the preservation and accessibility of biological evidence in a criminal or delinquency investigation or proceeding, the improvement of eyewitness identification procedures, the electronic recording of custodial interrogations, and to provide that DNA records collected in the DNA database and fingerprints filed for record cannot be sealed unless certain circumstances apply.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-24 - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-24 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-06 Effective Date
2010-04-05 Governor' Action
2010-04-10 End of 10-day period
2010-03-30 Sent to Governor
2010-03-24 Concurrence
2009-06-24 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2009-06-18 Committee Report - S
2009-03-11 To Judiciary Civil Justice
2009-03-11 Introduced to House
2010-03-16 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2010-01-14 Committee Report - S
2009-06-25 To Criminal Justice
2009-06-25 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
109561New CodeSee Bill Text
109573Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2901Amended CodeCitation Text
290107Amended CodeCitation Text
2933New CodeSee Bill Text
293381New CodeSee Bill Text
293382New CodeSee Bill Text
293383New CodeSee Bill Text
2953Amended CodeCitation Text
295321Amended CodeCitation Text
295323Amended CodeCitation Text
295331Amended CodeCitation Text
295332Amended CodeCitation Text
2953321Amended CodeCitation Text
295335Amended CodeCitation Text
295351Amended CodeCitation Text
295354Amended CodeCitation Text
295355Amended CodeCitation Text
295356New CodeSee Bill Text
295357New CodeSee Bill Text
295358New CodeSee Bill Text
295359New CodeSee Bill Text
295360New CodeSee Bill Text
295371Amended CodeCitation Text
295372Amended CodeCitation Text
295373Amended CodeCitation Text
295374Amended CodeCitation Text
295375Amended CodeCitation Text
295376Amended CodeCitation Text
295377Amended CodeCitation Text
295378Amended CodeCitation Text
295379Amended CodeCitation Text
295381Amended CodeCitation Text
295382Repealed CodeCitation Text
295383Amended CodeCitation Text
295384Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback