OH SB54 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-10)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1739.061, 1751.14, 1751.69, 3923.022, 3923.24, 3923.241, 3923.281, 3923.57, 3923.58, 3923.601, 3923.65, 3923.83, 3923.85, 3924.01, 4729.291, and 4729.541 and to enact sections 505.377, 737.082, 737.222, 3702.40, and 4731.056 of the Revised Code to require a mammography facility to include certain information in the mammography report summary sent to a patient under federal law if the patient's mammogram demonstrates the presence of dense breast tissue; to establish requirements regarding controlled substances containing buprenorphine used for the purpose of treating drug dependence or addiction; to clarify the status of volunteer firefighters for purposes of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act; to make changes regarding coverage for a dependent child under a parent's health insurance plan and the hours of work needed to qualify for coverage under a small employer health benefit plan; to increase the duration of the health insurance considered to be short-term under certain insurance laws; and to make changes to the chemotherapy parity law.
Title
To require a mammography facility to include certain information in the mammography report summary sent to a patient under federal law if the patient's mammogram demonstrates the presence of dense breast tissue; to establish requirements regarding controlled substances containing buprenorphine used for the purpose of treating drug dependence or addiction; to clarify the status of volunteer firefighters for purposes of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act; to make changes regarding coverage for a dependent child under a parent's health insurance plan and the hours of work needed to qualify for coverage under a small employer health benefit plan; to increase the duration of the health insurance considered to be short-term under certain insurance laws; and to make changes to the chemotherapy parity law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-05-14 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-02-25 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2013-02-25 | Introduced to House | |
2014-12-10 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-05-29 | To Health and Aging | |
2014-05-29 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 39 | 061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 51 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 69 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
37 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 02 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
39 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 23 | 022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 241 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 83 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 24 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
47 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 29 | 291 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 541 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 31 | 056 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 31 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
5 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 05 | 377 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
7 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
7 | 37 | 082 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 37 | 222 | New Code | See Bill Text |