OH SB43 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-12)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-12)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2101.16, 2151.011, 2151.23, 2923.125, 2923.1213, 2923.13, 2945.37, 2945.38, 2945.39, 2945.40, 2945.401, 2967.22, 5119.311, 5120.17, 5122.01, 5122.03, 5122.05, 5122.10, 5122.11, 5122.13, 5122.141, 5122.15, 5122.19, 5122.21, 5122.27, 5122.30, 5122.31, 5122.311, 5122.34, 5122.43, 5139.54, 5305.22, 5907.06, and 5907.09 and to enact section 5122.111 of the Revised Code to make changes to the laws governing the civil commitment of and treatment provided to mentally ill persons.
Title
To make changes to the laws governing the civil commitment of and treatment provided to mentally ill persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-17 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-02-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-02-19 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-02-14 | To Civil Justice | |
2013-02-14 | Introduced to House | |
2014-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-28 | Committee Report* A | |
2014-02-20 | To *Rules and Reference | |
2014-02-20 | Introduced to Senate |