OH SB342 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on December 26 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-12-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 3305.06, 3307.01, 3307.031, 3307.04, 3307.044, 3307.061, 3307.14, 3307.142, 3307.20, 3307.214, 3307.25, 3307.251, 3307.252, 3307.26, 3307.28, 3307.33, 3307.35, 3307.351, 3307.352, 3307.371, 3307.39, 3307.391, 3307.42, 3307.46, 3307.47, 3307.50, 3307.501, 3307.51, 3307.512, 3307.52, 3307.53, 3307.56, 3307.561, 3307.562, 3307.563, 3307.57, 3307.58, 3307.59, 3307.60, 3307.62, 3307.63, 3307.631, 3307.64, 3307.66, 3307.661, 3307.67, 3307.671, 3307.694, 3307.71, 3307.711, 3307.712, 3307.72, 3307.73, 3307.74, 3307.75, 3307.751, 3307.752, 3307.76, 3307.761, 3307.763, 3307.764, 3307.77, 3307.771, 3307.78, 3307.79, 3307.80, 3307.81, 3307.811, 3307.812, 3307.83, 3307.84, 3307.86, 3307.87, 3307.89, 3307.98, and 3313.975; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 3307.64 (3307.48) and 3307.70 (3307.701); to enact new section 3307.70 and section 3307.143; and to repeal sections 3307.54, 3307.61, 3307.741, 3307.88, 3307.881, and 3307.882 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing the State Teachers Retirement System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To revise the law governing the State Teachers Retirement System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-09-12 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-12 - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-26 Effective Date
2012-09-26 Governor' Action
2012-09-26 End of 10-day period
2012-09-14 Sent to Governor
2012-09-12 Concurrence
2012-05-16 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-16 Committee Report - S
2012-05-08 To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor
2012-05-08 Introduced to House
2012-09-12 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-09-10 Committee Report - S
2012-05-17 To Health & Aging
2012-05-17 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3305Amended CodeCitation Text
330506Amended CodeCitation Text
3307Amended CodeCitation Text
330701Amended CodeCitation Text
3307031Amended CodeCitation Text
330704Amended CodeCitation Text
3307044Amended CodeCitation Text
3307061Amended CodeCitation Text
330714Amended CodeCitation Text
3307142Amended CodeCitation Text
330720Amended CodeCitation Text
3307214Amended CodeCitation Text
330725Amended CodeCitation Text
3307251Amended CodeCitation Text
3307252Amended CodeCitation Text
330726Amended CodeCitation Text
330728Amended CodeCitation Text
330733Amended CodeCitation Text
330735Amended CodeCitation Text
3307351Amended CodeCitation Text
3307352Amended CodeCitation Text
3307371Amended CodeCitation Text
330739Amended CodeCitation Text
3307391Amended CodeCitation Text
330742Amended CodeCitation Text
330746Amended CodeCitation Text
330747Amended CodeCitation Text
330750Amended CodeCitation Text
3307501Amended CodeCitation Text
330751Amended CodeCitation Text
3307512Amended CodeCitation Text
330752Amended CodeCitation Text
330753Amended CodeCitation Text
330754Repealed CodeCitation Text
330756Amended CodeCitation Text
3307561Amended CodeCitation Text
3307562Amended CodeCitation Text
3307563Amended CodeCitation Text
330757Amended CodeCitation Text
330758Amended CodeCitation Text
330759Amended CodeCitation Text
330760Amended CodeCitation Text
330761Repealed CodeCitation Text
330762Amended CodeCitation Text
330763Amended CodeCitation Text
3307631Amended CodeCitation Text
330764Amended CodeCitation Text
330766Amended CodeCitation Text
3307661Amended CodeCitation Text
330767Amended CodeCitation Text
3307671Amended CodeCitation Text
3307694Amended CodeCitation Text
330770Amended CodeCitation Text
330771Amended CodeCitation Text
3307711Amended CodeCitation Text
3307712Amended CodeCitation Text
330772Amended CodeCitation Text
330773Amended CodeCitation Text
330774Amended CodeCitation Text
3307741Repealed CodeCitation Text
330775Amended CodeCitation Text
3307751Amended CodeCitation Text
3307752Amended CodeCitation Text
330776Amended CodeCitation Text
3307761Amended CodeCitation Text
3307763Amended CodeCitation Text
3307764Amended CodeCitation Text
330777Amended CodeCitation Text
3307771Amended CodeCitation Text
330778Amended CodeCitation Text
330779Amended CodeCitation Text
330780Amended CodeCitation Text
330781Amended CodeCitation Text
3307811Amended CodeCitation Text
3307812Amended CodeCitation Text
330783Amended CodeCitation Text
330784Amended CodeCitation Text
330786Amended CodeCitation Text
330787Amended CodeCitation Text
330788Repealed CodeCitation Text
3307881Repealed CodeCitation Text
3307882Repealed CodeCitation Text
330789Amended CodeCitation Text
330798Amended CodeCitation Text
3313Amended CodeCitation Text
3313975Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback