OH SB341 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on December 26 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-12-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 3309.05, 3309.051, 3309.061, 3309.07, 3309.072, 3309.074, 3309.075, 3309.10, 3309.15, 3309.21, 3309.22, 3309.23, 3309.26, 3309.28, 3309.33, 3309.34, 3309.341, 3309.343, 3309.35, 3309.353, 3309.354, 3309.36, 3309.362, 3309.371, 3309.373, 3309.376, 3309.379, 3309.3710, 3309.3711, 3309.39, 3309.401, 3309.41, 3309.44, 3309.45, 3309.46, 3309.47, 3309.50, 3309.51, 3309.69, 3309.81, and 3309.88; to enact new section 3309.571 and sections 3309.392 and 3309.474; and to repeal sections 3309.38 and 3309.571 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing the School Employees Retirement System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To revise the law governing the School Employees Retirement System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-09-12 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-12 - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-26 Effective Date
2012-09-26 Governor' Action
2012-09-26 End of 10-day period
2012-09-14 Sent to Governor
2012-09-12 Concurrence
2012-05-16 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-16 Committee Report - S
2012-05-08 To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor
2012-05-08 Introduced to House
2012-09-12 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-09-10 Committee Report - S
2012-05-17 To Health & Aging
2012-05-17 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3309Amended CodeCitation Text
330905Amended CodeCitation Text
3309051Amended CodeCitation Text
3309061Amended CodeCitation Text
330907Amended CodeCitation Text
3309072Amended CodeCitation Text
3309074Amended CodeCitation Text
3309075Amended CodeCitation Text
330910Amended CodeCitation Text
330915Amended CodeCitation Text
330921Amended CodeCitation Text
330922Amended CodeCitation Text
330923Amended CodeCitation Text
330926Amended CodeCitation Text
330928Amended CodeCitation Text
330933Amended CodeCitation Text
330934Amended CodeCitation Text
3309341Amended CodeCitation Text
3309343Amended CodeCitation Text
330935Amended CodeCitation Text
3309353Amended CodeCitation Text
3309354Amended CodeCitation Text
330936Amended CodeCitation Text
3309362Amended CodeCitation Text
3309371Amended CodeCitation Text
33093710Amended CodeCitation Text
33093711Amended CodeCitation Text
3309373Amended CodeCitation Text
3309376Amended CodeCitation Text
3309379Amended CodeCitation Text
330938Repealed CodeCitation Text
330939Amended CodeCitation Text
3309401Amended CodeCitation Text
330941Amended CodeCitation Text
330944Amended CodeCitation Text
330945Amended CodeCitation Text
330946Amended CodeCitation Text
330947Amended CodeCitation Text
330950Amended CodeCitation Text
330951Amended CodeCitation Text
3309571Repealed CodeCitation Text
330969Amended CodeCitation Text
330981Amended CodeCitation Text
330988Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback