OH SB316 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on September 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on September 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 124.38, 3301.04, 3301.079, 3301.0710, 3301.0712, 3301.0714, 3301.0715, 3301.0723, 3301.52, 3301.53, 3301.58, 3301.90, 3301.922, 3302.03, 3302.032, 3302.042, 3302.12, 3302.20, 3302.21, 3302.25, 3310.03, 3310.08, 3310.15, 3313.37, 3313.41, 3313.411, 3313.608, 3313.609, 3313.6013, 3313.674, 3313.813, 3313.816, 3313.842, 3313.843, 3313.845, 3313.978, 3314.015, 3314.016, 3314.02, 3314.029, 3314.03, 3314.06, 3314.08, 3314.17, 3314.18, 3314.35, 3314.36, 3317.01, 3317.11, 3318.034, 3318.36, 3318.37, 3318.371, 3318.70, 3319.02, 3319.06, 3319.11, 3319.111, 3319.112, 3319.58, 3321.01, 3323.011, 3323.052, 3323.19, 3326.03, 3326.04, 3326.10, 3326.11, 3326.17, 3326.21, 3328.15, 3328.24, 3333.0411, 4139.01, 4139.03, 4139.04, 4139.05, 4141.01, 4141.29, 4301.20, 5104.01, 5104.011, 5104.02, 5104.21, 5104.30, 5104.31, 5104.34, 5104.38, 5709.83, 5751.20, 6301.01, 6301.02, 6301.03, 6301.04, 6301.07, 6301.08, and 6301.10; to enact sections 3301.941, 3302.033, 3302.41, 3310.031, 3313.6411, 3313.847, 3314.11, 3314.15, 3318.364, 3326.031, 3326.26, 4123.391, 4141.293, 5104.031, 5104.032, 5104.033, 5123.022, and 5126.0222; and to repeal section 3319.19 of the Revised Code; to amend Sections 267.10.90, 267.50.30, and 283.20 of Am. Sub. H.B. 153 of the 129th General Assembly; and to repeal Section 267.60.23 of Am. Sub. H.B. 153 of the 129th General Assembly and Section 265.20.15 of Am. Sub. H.B. 1 of the 128th General Assembly to revise authorizations and conditions with respect to education, workforce development, and early childhood care; and to amend sections 109.57, 2151.011, 2919.227, 2923.124, 2923.126, 2923.1212, 2950.11, 2950.13, 3109.051, 3701.63, 3737.22, 3742.01, 3797.06, 4511.81, 5101.29, 5103.03, 5104.01, 5104.011, 5104.012, 5104.013, 5104.015, 5104.022, 5104.03, 5104.04, 5104.041, 5104.052, 5104.053, 5104.054, 5104.06, 5104.08, 5104.09, 5104.13, 5104.30, 5104.31, 5104.32, 5104.35, 5104.36, 5104.38, 5107.60, and 5153.175, to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 5104.011 (5104.015), 5104.015 (5104.25), 5104.031 (5104.035), 5104.032 (5104.036), and 5104.033 (5104.037), to enact new sections 5104.032 and 5104.033 and sections 5104.016, 5104.017, 5104.018, 5104.019, 5104.0110, 5104.0111, 5104.0112, 5104.034, 5104.038, 5104.039, and 5104.14, and to repeal sections 5104.014 and 5104.11 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing type B family day-care homes on January 1, 2014.
Title
To revise the law governing type B family day-care homes on January 1, 2014.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-24 | Effective Date | |
2012-06-25 | Governor' Action | |
2012-07-02 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-06-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-05-08 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-03-22 | To Education | |
2012-03-22 | Introduced to House | |
2012-06-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-06-13 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-05-10 | To Education | |
2012-05-10 | Introduced to Senate |