OH SB315 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9)
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-03 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-03 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 5.2296 of the Revised Code to designate May as "Asthma Awareness Month" and to designate May 5 as "Childhood Asthma Awareness Day."
Title
To designate May as "Asthma Awareness Month" and to designate May 5 as "Childhood Asthma Awareness Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-11-19 | Committee Report | |
2014-03-31 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2014-03-31 | Introduced to House | |
2014-12-04 | To Health and Aging | |
2014-12-04 | Introduced to Senate |