OH SB315 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 10 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 122.075, 123.011, 125.836, 131.50, 133.06, 156.01, 156.02, 156.03, 156.04, 303.213, 905.40, 1509.01, 1509.02, 1509.03, 1509.04, 1509.06, 1509.07, 1509.10, 1509.11, 1509.22, 1509.221, 1509.222, 1509.223, 1509.23, 1509.28, 1509.33, 1509.99, 1514.01, 1514.02, 1514.021, 1514.03, 1514.05, 3706.27, 4905.03, 4905.90, 4905.91, 4905.95, 4906.01, 4906.03, 4906.05, 4906.06, 4906.07, 4906.10, 4906.20, 4928.01, 4928.02, 4928.2314, 4928.61, 4928.62, 4928.64, 4928.66, 4935.04, 5703.21, and 5751.01; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 905.461 (905.411); and to enact sections 905.41, 3737.832, 4905.911, 4928.111, 4928.70, 4928.71, 4928.72, and 6301.12 of the Revised Code to make changes to the energy and natural resources laws and related programs of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To make changes to the energy and natural resources laws and related programs of the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-24 - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 52 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Amendment (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 53 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-10 Effective Date
2012-06-11 Governor' Action
2012-06-11 End of 10-day period
2012-05-30 Sent to Governor
2012-05-24 Concurrence
2012-05-15 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-15 Committee Report - S
2012-03-22 To Energy & Public Utilities
2012-03-22 Introduced to House
2012-05-24 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-05-23 Committee Report - S
2012-05-15 To Public Utilities
2012-05-15 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
122075Amended CodeCitation Text
123Amended CodeCitation Text
123011Amended CodeCitation Text
125Amended CodeCitation Text
125836Amended CodeCitation Text
131Amended CodeCitation Text
13150Amended CodeCitation Text
133Amended CodeCitation Text
13306Amended CodeCitation Text
156Amended CodeCitation Text
15601Amended CodeCitation Text
15602Amended CodeCitation Text
15603Amended CodeCitation Text
15604Amended CodeCitation Text
15Amended CodeCitation Text
1505Amended CodeCitation Text
150509Amended CodeCitation Text
1509Amended CodeCitation Text
150901Amended CodeCitation Text
150902Amended CodeCitation Text
150903Amended CodeCitation Text
150904Amended CodeCitation Text
150906Amended CodeCitation Text
150907Amended CodeCitation Text
150910Amended CodeCitation Text
150911Amended CodeCitation Text
150922Amended CodeCitation Text
1509221Amended CodeCitation Text
1509222Amended CodeCitation Text
1509223Amended CodeCitation Text
150923Amended CodeCitation Text
150928Amended CodeCitation Text
150931Amended CodeCitation Text
150933Amended CodeCitation Text
150950Amended CodeCitation Text
150999Amended CodeCitation Text
1514Amended CodeCitation Text
151401Amended CodeCitation Text
151402Amended CodeCitation Text
1514021Amended CodeCitation Text
151403Amended CodeCitation Text
151405Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
303Amended CodeCitation Text
303213Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3706Amended CodeCitation Text
370627Amended CodeCitation Text
3737New CodeSee Bill Text
3737832New CodeSee Bill Text
49Amended CodeCitation Text
4905Amended CodeCitation Text
490503Amended CodeCitation Text
490590Amended CodeCitation Text
490591Amended CodeCitation Text
4905911New CodeSee Bill Text
4905912New CodeSee Bill Text
490595Amended CodeCitation Text
4906Amended CodeCitation Text
490601Amended CodeCitation Text
490603Amended CodeCitation Text
490605Amended CodeCitation Text
490606Amended CodeCitation Text
490607Amended CodeCitation Text
490610Amended CodeCitation Text
490620Amended CodeCitation Text
490699Amended CodeCitation Text
4928Amended CodeCitation Text
492801Amended CodeCitation Text
492802Amended CodeCitation Text
4928111New CodeSee Bill Text
4928143Amended CodeCitation Text
49282314Amended CodeCitation Text
492861Amended CodeCitation Text
492862Amended CodeCitation Text
492864Amended CodeCitation Text
492865Amended CodeCitation Text
492866Amended CodeCitation Text
492870New CodeSee Bill Text
492871New CodeSee Bill Text
492872New CodeSee Bill Text
4935Amended CodeCitation Text
493504Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5703Amended CodeCitation Text
570321Amended CodeCitation Text
5727New CodeSee Bill Text
5727821New CodeSee Bill Text
5751Amended CodeCitation Text
575101Amended CodeCitation Text
61Amended CodeCitation Text
6111Amended CodeCitation Text
611130Amended CodeCitation Text
611132New CodeSee Bill Text
63New CodeSee Bill Text
6301New CodeSee Bill Text
630112New CodeSee Bill Text
9Amended CodeCitation Text
905Amended CodeCitation Text
90540Amended CodeCitation Text
90541New CodeSee Bill Text
905461Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback