OH SB301 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 70-36)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 70-36)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 5.211 of the Revised Code to designate the week in May each year, which coincides with Armed Forces Week, as "Ohio Warrior Awareness Week."
Title
To designate the week in May each year, which coincides with Armed Forces Week, as "Ohio Warrior Awareness Week."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-11-12 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Effective Date | |
2014-12-02 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-06 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-11-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-11-12 | Concurrence | |
2014-04-08 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-04-07 | Committee Report | |
2014-03-20 | To Public Safety, Local Government & Veteran Affairs | |
2014-03-20 | Introduced to House | |
2014-11-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-28 | Committee Report | |
2014-04-09 | To Military and Veterans Affairs | |
2014-04-09 | Introduced to Senate |