OH SB300 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-22)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-22)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 5.2250 of the Revised Code to designate September as "Mitochondrial Disease Awareness Month."
Title
To designate September as "Mitochondrial Disease Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-17 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-05-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-05-21 | Committee Report | |
2014-03-20 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2014-03-20 | Introduced to House | |
2014-06-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-06-04 | Committee Report | |
2014-05-29 | To Health and Aging | |
2014-05-29 | Introduced to Senate |