OH SB294 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 3714.07, 3714.073, 3734.01, 3734.02, 3734.021, 3734.027, 3734.05, 3734.06, 3734.12, 3734.121, 3734.41, 3734.42, 3734.57, 3734.573, 3734.85, 3737.87, 3737.88, 3745.11, 3745.31, 3746.02, 6109.31, 6109.32, 6111.02, 6111.022, 6111.023, 6111.024, 6111.025, 6111.027, 6111.03, 6111.035, and 6111.30, to enact sections 3745.017, 6109.99, and 6111.0382, and to repeal sections 3734.022, 3734.131, 3734.132, and 3734.133 of the Revised Code to revise the laws governing environmental protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To revise the laws governing environmental protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-24 - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-05 Effective Date
2012-06-05 Governor' Action
2012-06-11 End of 10-day period
2012-05-30 Sent to Governor
2012-05-24 Concurrence
2012-04-24 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-04-24 Committee Report - S
2012-02-09 To Agriculture, Environment & Natural Resources
2012-02-09 Introduced to House
2012-05-23 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-05-17 Committee Report - S
2012-04-24 To Agriculture & Natural Resources
2012-04-24 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3714Amended CodeCitation Text
371407Amended CodeCitation Text
3714073Amended CodeCitation Text
3734Amended CodeCitation Text
373401Amended CodeCitation Text
373402Amended CodeCitation Text
3734021Amended CodeCitation Text
3734022Repealed CodeCitation Text
3734027Amended CodeCitation Text
373405Amended CodeCitation Text
373406Amended CodeCitation Text
373412Amended CodeCitation Text
3734121Amended CodeCitation Text
3734131Repealed CodeCitation Text
3734132Repealed CodeCitation Text
3734133Repealed CodeCitation Text
373441Amended CodeCitation Text
373442Amended CodeCitation Text
373457Amended CodeCitation Text
3734573Amended CodeCitation Text
373485Amended CodeCitation Text
3737Amended CodeCitation Text
373787Amended CodeCitation Text
373788Amended CodeCitation Text
3745Amended CodeCitation Text
3745017New CodeSee Bill Text
374511Amended CodeCitation Text
374531Amended CodeCitation Text
3746Amended CodeCitation Text
374602Amended CodeCitation Text
61Amended CodeCitation Text
6109Amended CodeCitation Text
610931Amended CodeCitation Text
610932Amended CodeCitation Text
610999New CodeSee Bill Text
6111Amended CodeCitation Text
611102Amended CodeCitation Text
6111022Amended CodeCitation Text
6111023Amended CodeCitation Text
6111024Amended CodeCitation Text
6111025Amended CodeCitation Text
6111027Amended CodeCitation Text
611103Amended CodeCitation Text
6111035Amended CodeCitation Text
61110382New CodeSee Bill Text
611130Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback