OH SB288 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-24)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1739.061, 1751.14, 1751.69, 2329.66, 3769.21, 3923.022, 3923.24, 3923.241, 3923.281, 3923.57, 3923.58, 3923.601, 3923.65, 3923.83, 3923.85, 3924.01, 4729.291, and 4729.541 and to enact sections 143.01 to 143.11, 505.377, 737.082, 737.222, and 4731.056 of the Revised Code to create the Volunteer Peace Officers' Dependents Fund to provide death benefits to survivors of volunteer peace officers killed in the line of duty and disability benefits to disabled volunteer peace officers, to clarify the status of volunteer firefighters for purposes of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, to make changes regarding coverage for a dependent child under a parent's health insurance plan and the hours of work needed to qualify for coverage under a small employer health benefit plan, to increase the duration of the health insurance considered to be short-term under certain insurance laws, and to make changes to the chemotherapy parity law, to establish requirements regarding controlled substances containing buprenorphine used for the purpose of treating drug dependence or addiction, and to specify the use of video lottery terminal revenue.
Title
To create the Volunteer Peace Officers' Dependents Fund to provide death benefits to survivors of volunteer peace officers killed in the line of duty and disability benefits to disabled volunteer peace officers, to clarify the status of volunteer firefighters for purposes of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, to make changes regarding coverage for a dependent child under a parent's health insurance plan and the hours of work needed to qualify for coverage under a small employer health benefit plan, to increase the duration of the health insurance considered to be short-term under certain insurance laws, and to make changes to the chemotherapy parity law, to establish requirements regarding controlled substances containing buprenorphine used for the purpose of treating drug dependence or addiction, and to specify the use of video lottery terminal revenue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-10 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 56 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 56 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-05-28 | Committee Report | |
2014-02-25 | To Insurance & Financial Institutions | |
2014-02-25 | Introduced to House | |
2014-12-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-10 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-05-29 | To Health and Aging | |
2014-05-29 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 43 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 39 | 061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 51 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 69 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 29 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 69 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 69 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
39 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 23 | 022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 241 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 83 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 24 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 29 | 291 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 541 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 31 | 056 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
5 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 05 | 377 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
7 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
7 | 37 | 082 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 37 | 222 | New Code | See Bill Text |