OH SB287 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on November 29 2012 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-11 - Conference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 4757.41, 4758.01, 4758.02, 4758.10, 4758.20, 4758.21, 4758.22, 4758.23, 4758.24, 4758.26, 4758.27, 4758.30, 4758.40, 4758.41, 4758.42, 4758.43, 4758.44, 4758.45, 4758.51, 4758.55, 4758.56, 4758.59, 4758.61, 4758.70, and 5111.20; to enact sections 4758.221, 4758.241, 4758.39, 4758.46, 4758.47, 4758.52, 4758.54, and 4758.561; and to repeal sections 3793.07, 4758.04, 4758.53, and 4758.58 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing the professions of chemical dependency counseling and alcohol and other drug prevention and to remove wheelchairs from nursing facilities' Medicaid direct care costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To revise the law governing the professions of chemical dependency counseling and alcohol and other drug prevention and to remove wheelchairs from nursing facilities' Medicaid direct care costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-05 - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 1 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-11-29 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-11 Conference Committee
2012-04-18 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-04-03 Committee Report - S
2012-01-31 To Health, Human Services, & Aging
2012-01-31 Introduced to House
2012-11-29 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-11-29 Committee Report - S
2012-04-24 To Health & Aging
2012-04-24 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37Repealed CodeCitation Text
3793Repealed CodeCitation Text
379307Repealed CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4757Amended CodeCitation Text
475741Amended CodeCitation Text
4758Amended CodeCitation Text
475801Amended CodeCitation Text
475802Amended CodeCitation Text
475804Repealed CodeCitation Text
475810Amended CodeCitation Text
475820Amended CodeCitation Text
475821Amended CodeCitation Text
475822Amended CodeCitation Text
4758221New CodeSee Bill Text
475823Amended CodeCitation Text
475824Amended CodeCitation Text
4758241New CodeSee Bill Text
475826Amended CodeCitation Text
475827Amended CodeCitation Text
475830Amended CodeCitation Text
475839New CodeSee Bill Text
475840Amended CodeCitation Text
475841Amended CodeCitation Text
475842Amended CodeCitation Text
475843Amended CodeCitation Text
475844Amended CodeCitation Text
475845Amended CodeCitation Text
475846New CodeSee Bill Text
475847New CodeSee Bill Text
475851Amended CodeCitation Text
475852New CodeSee Bill Text
475853Repealed CodeCitation Text
475854New CodeSee Bill Text
475855Amended CodeCitation Text
475856Amended CodeCitation Text
4758561New CodeSee Bill Text
475858Repealed CodeCitation Text
475859Amended CodeCitation Text
475861Amended CodeCitation Text
475870Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5111Amended CodeCitation Text
511120Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback