OH SB281 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-03 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-03 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 5.2288 of the Revised Code to designate the month of May as "Bartter Syndrome Awareness Month."
Title
To designate the month of May as "Bartter Syndrome Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-05-28 | Committee Report | |
2014-02-12 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2014-02-12 | Introduced to House | |
2014-12-10 | Committee Report | |
2014-06-04 | To Health and Aging | |
2014-06-04 | Introduced to Senate |