OH SB278 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-31)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-31)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 313.121 of the Revised Code to require the completion of a sudden unexplained infant death investigation reporting form (SUIDI reporting form) developed by the United States Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, or an alternative reporting form developed by the Director of Health, whenever a child one year of age or younger dies suddenly and unexpectedly and to require that the appropriate child fatality review board receive a copy of each completed form.
Title
To require the completion of a sudden unexplained infant death investigation reporting form (SUIDI reporting form) developed by the United States Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, or an alternative reporting form developed by the Director of Health, whenever a child one year of age or younger dies suddenly and unexpectedly and to require that the appropriate child fatality review board receive a copy of each completed form.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-17 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-04-02 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-04-02 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-02-12 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2014-02-12 | Introduced to House | |
2014-06-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-21 | Committee Report | |
2014-04-03 | To Health and Aging | |
2014-04-03 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
3 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 13 | 121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |