OH SB276 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-11)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-11)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2925.02, 3701.63, 3701.64, 3719.01, 3719.061, 4715.14, 4715.30, 4723.28, 4723.481, 4723.486, 4725.16, 4725.19, 4729.12, 4729.16, 4729.18, 4729.85, 4729.86, 4730.25, 4730.41, 4730.48, 4731.22, 4731.281, 4773.03, 4773.08, 5165.08, 5165.513, 5165.515, and 5165.99; to enact sections 3701.66, 3701.67, and 3701.68; and to repeal sections 4715.15, 4723.433, 4730.093, and 4731.77 of the Revised Code to create the Commission on Infant Mortality and require the establishment of infant safe sleep procedures and policies; to modify the offense of "corrupting another with drugs"; to require the State Board of Pharmacy to prepare semiannual reports on opioid prescriptions; to revise the laws governing the Ohio Automated Rx Reporting System and opioid prescriptions issued for minors; to require under certain conditions the reinstatement of inactive licenses to practice certain radiologic professions; to eliminate requirements regarding patient notice of the limits of Lyme disease testing; to retain certain laws regarding nursing facilities' admission policies and exclusions of parts of nursing facilities from Medicaid provider agreements; to amend the versions of 4715.30, 4715.302, 4723.28, 4723.487, 4725.092, 4725.19, 4730.25, 4730.53, 4731.055, and 4731.22 of the Revised Code that are scheduled to take effect April 1, 2015, to continue the provisions of this act on and after that effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
That are scheduled to take effect April 1, 2015, to continue the provisions of this act on and after that effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Passed as emergency measure (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Passed as emergency measure (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-30 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-12-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-12-11 | Concurrence | |
2014-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-05-28 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-02-12 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2014-02-12 | Introduced to House | |
2014-12-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-04 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-06-04 | To Health and Aging | |
2014-06-04 | Introduced to Senate |