OH SB268 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-08-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 2901.07, 2953.51, 2953.52, and 2953.53 of the Revised Code to provide for the taking of a DNA sample from a person who is charged with a felony but not arrested for the offense or whose DNA sample related to a felony offense was not taken when required and to provide for a court order, upon the person's request, requiring the Bureau of Criminal Identification and Investigation to seal DNA specimens, records, and profiles taken from a person when the person is found not guilty, the charges are dismissed with prejudice, or the charges are dismissed without prejudice and the statute of limitations has expired.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide for the taking of a DNA sample from a person who is charged with a felony but not arrested for the offense or whose DNA sample related to a felony offense was not taken when required and to provide for a court order, upon the person's request, requiring the Bureau of Criminal Identification and Investigation to seal DNA specimens, records, and profiles taken from a person when the person is found not guilty, the charges are dismissed with prejudice, or the charges are dismissed without prejudice and the statute of limitations has expired.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-18 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-06 Effective Date
2012-05-04 Governor' Action
2012-05-08 End of 10-day period
2012-04-26 Sent to Governor
2012-04-18 Concurrence
2012-02-01 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-02-01 Committee Report - S
2011-12-08 To Judiciary
2011-12-08 Introduced to House
2012-04-18 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-03-21 Committee Report
2012-02-02 To Criminal Justice
2012-02-02 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2901Amended CodeCitation Text
290107Amended CodeCitation Text
2953Amended CodeCitation Text
295351Amended CodeCitation Text
295352Amended CodeCitation Text
295353Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback