OH SB263 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 59-18)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 59-18)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 5703.05 and to enact section 5703.77 of the Revised Code to require the Tax Commissioner to notify taxpayers of tax or fee overpayments, to authorize the Commissioner to either apply an overpayment to future tax liabilities or issue a refund, and to make an appropriation.
Title
To require the Tax Commissioner to notify taxpayers of tax or fee overpayments, to authorize the Commissioner to either apply an overpayment to future tax liabilities or issue a refund, and to make an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-17 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-02-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-02-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-01-14 | To Finance | |
2014-01-14 | Introduced to House | |
2014-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-21 | Committee Report - A | |
2014-02-13 | To Finance and Appropriations | |
2014-02-13 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 03 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 03 | 77 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 39 | 121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |