OH SB260 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-04-16 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-04-16 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Summary
To amend sections 9.63, 311.07, and 341.21 of the Revised Code to provide that a board of county commissioners may direct a sheriff to take custody of persons who are being detained for deportation or who are charged with civil violations of immigration law and to expressly authorize state and local employees and county sheriffs to render assistance to federal immigration officials in the investigation and enforcement of federal immigration law.
Title
Immigration violations-aid federal enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-16 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2008-04-15 | Committee Report | |
2007-11-21 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2007-11-21 | Introduced to House | |
2008-04-22 | To State Government & Elections | |
2008-04-22 | Introduced to Senate |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_SB_260 |