OH SB258 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-8)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-8)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 4725.01 and 4725.091 and to enact sections 3901.81, 3901.811, 3901.812, 3901.813, 3901.814, and 3901.815 of the Revised Code to establish standards for the performance of pharmacy audits in Ohio and to authorize the continued use of certain analgesic controlled substances in the practice of optometry.
Title
To establish standards for the performance of pharmacy audits in Ohio and to authorize the continued use of certain analgesic controlled substances in the practice of optometry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-29 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-12-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-12-02 | Concurrence | |
2014-03-25 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-03-25 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-12-16 | To Insurance & Financial Institutions | |
2013-12-16 | Introduced to House | |
2014-11-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-11-19 | Committee Report - A | |
2014-03-26 | To *Rules and Reference | |
2014-03-26 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
39 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 01 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 411 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 412 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 413 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 414 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 415 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 81 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 811 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 812 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 813 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 814 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 815 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 25 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 25 | 091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |