OH SB255 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 4503.20, 4509.101, 4509.102, 4509.103, and 4509.45 of the Revised Code to permit a person to present proof of financial responsibility to the Registrar of Motor Vehicles, a peace officer, a traffic violations bureau, or a court through use of an electronic wireless communications device.
Title
To permit a person to present proof of financial responsibility to the Registrar of Motor Vehicles, a peace officer, a traffic violations bureau, or a court through use of an electronic wireless communications device.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-09 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-30 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-12-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-12-09 | Concurrence | |
2014-06-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-05-28 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-12-10 | To Transportation | |
2013-12-10 | Introduced to House | |
2014-12-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-04 | Committee Report | |
2014-06-04 | To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2014-06-04 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 03 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 09 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 09 | 102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 09 | 103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 09 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |