OH SB250 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-12-17 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 3107.055, 3107.062, 3107.063, 3107.064, 3107.07, 3107.16, 5103.17, 5747.37, and 5747.98 and to enact sections 3107.067, 3107.068, 3107.069, 3107.0611, 3107.0612, 3107.0613, and 3107.0614 of the Revised Code to require that certain pre-birth adoption notifications be sent to each putative father; to reduce the time within which a putative father must register with the putative father registry; to reduce the period of time to appeal an adoption decree; to permit certain entities to advertise regarding the adoption of children; to define for purposes of an adoption "living expenses" of a birth mother and to specify how they must be paid; and to increase the adoption income tax credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require that certain pre-birth adoption notifications be sent to each putative father; to reduce the time within which a putative father must register with the putative father registry; to reduce the period of time to appeal an adoption decree; to permit certain entities to advertise regarding the adoption of children; to define for purposes of an adoption "living expenses" of a birth mother and to specify how they must be paid; and to increase the adoption income tax credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-17 - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-17 Concurrence
2014-12-09 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2014-12-09 Committee Report - S
2013-12-04 To Civil Justice
2013-12-04 Introduced to House
2014-12-17 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2014-12-17 Committee Report
2014-12-10 To Health and Aging
2014-12-10 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31Amended CodeCitation Text
3107Amended CodeCitation Text
3107055Amended CodeCitation Text
3107056New CodeSee Bill Text
31070610New CodeSee Bill Text
31070611New CodeSee Bill Text
31070612New CodeSee Bill Text
31070613New CodeSee Bill Text
31070614New CodeSee Bill Text
31070615New CodeSee Bill Text
31070616New CodeSee Bill Text
3107062Amended CodeCitation Text
3107063Amended CodeCitation Text
3107064Amended CodeCitation Text
3107067New CodeSee Bill Text
3107068New CodeSee Bill Text
3107069New CodeSee Bill Text
310707Amended CodeCitation Text
310716Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5103Amended CodeCitation Text
510317Amended CodeCitation Text
5103171New CodeSee Bill Text
5103172Amended CodeCitation Text
5103173New CodeSee Bill Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574737Amended CodeCitation Text
574798Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback