OH SB238 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3509.01 and 3511.10 of the Revised Code to reduce the days for absent voting.
Title
To reduce the days for absent voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-02-21 | Governor' Action | |
2014-03-05 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-02-21 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-02-19 | Concurrence | |
2013-11-20 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-20 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-11-13 | To State Government Oversight & Reform | |
2013-11-13 | Introduced to House | |
2014-02-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-02-12 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-11-20 | To Policy and Legislative Oversight | |
2013-11-20 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
35 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 09 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 11 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |