OH SB230 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 4729.03 and to enact section 4729.43 of the Revised Code to change the requirements to serve as the Executive Director of the State Board of Pharmacy and to establish standards for the delivery of non-self-injectable cancer drugs.
Title
To change the requirements to serve as the Executive Director of the State Board of Pharmacy and to establish standards for the delivery of non-self-injectable cancer drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 37 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 37 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-17 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-01-22 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-01-22 | Committee Report | |
2013-11-07 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2013-11-07 | Introduced to House | |
2014-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-21 | Committee Report | |
2014-01-23 | To Health and Aging | |
2014-01-23 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
47 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 29 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |