OH SB208 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 102.01, 103.63, 1309.102, 1309.105, 1309.307, 1309.311, 1309.316, 1309.317, 1309.326, 1309.406, 1309.408, 1309.502, 1309.503, 1309.507, 1309.515, 1309.516, 1309.518, 1309.521, and 1309.607 of the Revised Code to make changes to Ohio's Uniform Commercial Code and to provide that the Joint Legislative Ethics Committee is the appropriate ethics commission for matters relating to the public member appointees to the Constitutional Modernization Commission.
Title
To make changes to Ohio's Uniform Commercial Code and to provide that the Joint Legislative Ethics Committee is the appropriate ethics commission for matters relating to the public member appointees to the Constitutional Modernization Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-03 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-02 | Governor' Action | |
2012-04-10 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-03-29 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Concurrence | |
2011-12-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-12-08 | Committee Report | |
2011-08-30 | To Judiciary Civil Justice | |
2011-08-30 | Introduced to House | |
2012-03-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-03-28 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-12-15 | To Judiciary & Ethics | |
2011-12-15 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 02 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 03 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
13 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
13 | 09 | 102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 307 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 317 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 326 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 408 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 507 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 516 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 518 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 521 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 09 | 607 | Amended Code | Citation Text |