OH SB206 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 191.02, 5162.01, 5162.13, 5162.131, 5162.132, 5162.20, 5163.01, 5163.06, 5163.09, 5163.0910, and 5164.911; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 5163.0910 (5162.133); to enact sections 103.41, 103.411, 103.412, 103.413, 103.414, 103.415, 191.08, 355.01, 355.02, 355.03, 355.04, 5162.134, 5162.70, 5162.71, and 5164.94; and to repeal sections 101.39, 101.391, and 5163.099 of the Revised Code; to amend Section 323.90 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly; to require implementation of certain Medicaid revisions, reform systems, and program oversight; to provide for government programs that provide public benefits to prioritize employment goals; to permit a board of county commissioners to establish a county Healthier Buckeye council; and to make an appropriation.
Title
; to amend Section 323.90 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly; to require implementation of certain Medicaid revisions, reform systems, and program oversight; to provide for government programs that provide public benefits to prioritize employment goals; to permit a board of county commissioners to establish a county Healthier Buckeye council; and to make an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 55 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 55 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 55 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Effective Date | |
2013-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2013-12-24 | End of 10-day period | |
2013-12-12 | Sent to Governor | |
2013-12-04 | Concurrence | |
2013-11-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-13 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-10-10 | To Finance | |
2013-10-10 | Introduced to House | |
2013-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-12-04 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-11-14 | To Finance and Appropriations | |
2013-11-14 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 01 | Repealed Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 01 | 39 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
1 | 01 | 391 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
1 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 03 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 03 | 411 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 03 | 412 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 03 | 413 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 03 | 414 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 03 | 415 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 91 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 91 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 91 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
3 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 55 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 55 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 55 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 55 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 62 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 62 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 62 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 62 | 131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 62 | 132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 62 | 134 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 62 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 62 | 70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 62 | 71 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 63 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 63 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 63 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 63 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 63 | 0910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 63 | 099 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
51 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 64 | 911 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 64 | 94 | New Code | See Bill Text |