OH SB172 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-15)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-15)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 317.32, 319.203, 319.54, 321.261, 323.131, 323.25, 323.28, 323.47, 323.65, 323.69, 323.70, 323.71, 323.72, 323.73, 323.78, 323.79, 715.261, 743.04, 1724.02, 1724.10, 2744.01, 5709.12, 5721.01, 5721.03, 5721.14, 5721.18, 5721.19, 5721.36, 5722.01, 5722.03, 5722.04, 5722.07, 5722.10, 5722.11, 5723.01, 5723.04, 5723.12, and 6119.06 and to enact sections 323.691 and 5722.031 of the Revised Code to modify the laws governing land reutilization programs and property tax foreclosures and to make changes to the county auditor's review of real property conveyances.
Title
To modify the laws governing land reutilization programs and property tax foreclosures and to make changes to the county auditor's review of real property conveyances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-28 - House - House - Conference report agree to (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House - Conference report agree to (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 0 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 0 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House - Conference report agree to (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 0 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 0 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-05 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-11 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-05-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-05-28 | Concurrence | |
2013-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-21 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-08-08 | To Public Safety, Local Government & Veteran Affairs | |
2013-08-08 | Introduced to House | |
2014-04-02 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-02-26 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-12-10 | To Financial Institutions, Housing and Urban Development | |
2013-12-10 | Introduced to Senate |