OH SB171 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 57-23)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 57-23)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 9.90, 101.532, 101.83, 101.84, 101.85, 101.86, 102.02, 109.91, 121.32, 127.14, 173.03, 173.04, 3302.021, 3311.71, 3312.01, 3312.09, 3313.202, 3701.025, 3701.63, 3727.312, 3737.03, 3737.21, 3737.81, 3737.86, 3737.88, 3743.54, 3746.04, 4117.03, 4121.03, 4121.12, 4121.121, 4121.125, 4121.128, 4123.341, 4123.342, 4123.35, 5111.708, 5123.032, and 5123.093; and to repeal sections 9.901, 101.37, 121.374, 122.97, 122.971, 122.98, 122.981, 125.833, 184.23, 184.231, 1349.71, 1349.72, 1501.25, 2151.282, 3306.29, 3306.291, 3306.292, 3306.50, 3306.51, 3306.52, 3306.53, 3306.54, 3306.55, 3306.56, 3306.57, 3306.58, 3306.59, 3311.77, 3312.11, 3312.12, 3319.70, 3319.71, 3701.92, 3727.322, 3746.03, 4121.75, 4121.76, 4121.77, 4121.78, 4121.79, 4501.025, 5111.709, 5111.7010, 5123.60, and 5902.15 of the Revised Code; and to amend Section 5 of Sub. H.B. 125 of the 127th General Assembly as subsequently amended, Section 20 of Am. Sub. H.B. 554 of the 127th General Assembly, Section 3 of Sub. H.B. 187 of the 126th General Assembly, and Section 513.03 of Am. Sub. H.B. 66 of the 126th General Assembly as subsequently amended; and to repeal Section 3 of Sub. H.B. 495 of the 128th General Assembly, Sections 209.40, 309.40.70, and 709.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 1 of the 128th General Assembly, Sections 755.80 and 756.40 of Am. Sub. H.B. 2 of the 128th General Assembly, Section 3 of Sub. H.B. 7 of the 127th General Assembly, Section 555.17 of Am. Sub. H.B. 67 of the 127th General Assembly, Sections 263.30.30, 337.20.20, 377.20, and 737.11 of Am. Sub. H.B. 119 of the 127th General Assembly, Sections 6 and 7 of Sub. H.B. 125 of the 127th General Assembly, Section 2 of Sub. H.B. 233 of the 127th General Assembly, Sections 703.30 and 715.50 of Am. Sub. H.B. 562 of the 127th General Assembly, Section 4 of Am. Sub. S.B. 77 of the 127th General Assembly, Sections 206.10.12, 206.42.12, 206.66.24, 206.66.43, 209.63.58, 503.09, and 503.12 of Am. Sub. H.B. 66 of the 126th General Assembly, Section 4 of Sub. H.B. 187 of the 126th General Assembly, Section 1 of Sub. H.B. 371 of the 126th General Assembly, Section 235.60.70 of Am. Sub. H.B. 699 of the 126th General Assembly, Section 3 of Am. Sub. S.B. 167 of the 126th General Assembly, Section 5 of Am. Sub. S.B. 260 of the 126th General Assembly, Section 3 of Sub. S.B. 393 of the 126th General Assembly, Sections 12 and 25 of Am. Sub. H.B. 87 of the 125th General Assembly, Sections 41.35 and 153 of Am. Sub. H.B. 95 of the 125th General Assembly, Section 8 of Sub. H.B. 299 of the 125th General Assembly, Section 6 of Am. Sub. H.B. 516 of the 125th General Assembly, Section 3 of Am. Sub. S.B. 86 of the 125th General Assembly, Section 3 of Sub. H.B. 230 of the 124th General Assembly, Section 3 of Am. Sub. H.B. 474 of the 124th General Assembly, Section 4 of Am. Sub. S.B. 281 of the 124th General Assembly, Section 3 of Am. H.B. 416 of the 127th General Assembly as subsequently amended, Section 701.20 of Am. Sub. H.B. 562 of the 127th General Assembly as subsequently amended, Section 206.66.53 of Am. Sub. H.B. 66 of the 126th General Assembly as subsequently amended, Section 6 of Sub. H.B. 336 of the 126th General Assembly as subsequently amended, Section 755.03 of Am. Sub. H.B. 530 of the 126th General Assembly as subsequently amended, Section 6 of Am. Sub. S.B. 238 of the 126th General Assembly as subsequently amended, Section 152 of Am. Sub. H.B. 95 of the 125th General Assembly as subsequently amended, and Section 59.29 of Am. Sub. H.B. 95 of the 125th General Assembly as subsequently amended to implement the recommendations of the Sunset Review Committee by abolishing, terminating, transferring, or renewing various agencies and by reestablishing the Sunset Review Committee but postponing its operation until the 131st General Assembly, to terminate the operation of certain provisions of this act on December 31, 2016, by repealing sections 101.82, 101.83, 101.84, 101.85, 101.86, and 101.87 of the Revised Code on that date, and to declare an emergency.
Title
On that date, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2011-06-30 | Governor' Action | |
2011-07-08 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-06-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-06-23 | Concurrence | |
2011-06-21 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-06-16 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-05-17 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2011-05-17 | Introduced to House | |
2011-06-23 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-06-23 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-06-22 | To State Government & Elections | |
2011-06-22 | Introduced to Senate |