OH SB165 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 1509.01, 1509.02, 1509.03, 1509.04, 1509.05, 1509.06, 1509.07, 1509.071, 1509.072, 1509.10, 1509.11, 1509.12, 1509.13, 1509.14, 1509.17, 1509.18, 1509.20, 1509.21, 1509.22, 1509.221, 1509.222, 1509.225, 1509.226, 1509.23, 1509.24, 1509.27, 1509.31, 1509.35, 1509.36, 1565.07, 1565.13, 1571.05, 5703.052, 5703.21, 5749.01, 5749.03, 5749.06, 5749.07, 5749.08, 5749.10, 5749.12, 5749.13, 5749.14, 5749.15, and 5749.17 and to enact sections 1509.021, 1509.041, 1509.062, 1509.073, 1509.181, 1509.19, 1509.34, 1509.50, 1509.60, 1509.61, 1571.18, and 4929.041 of the Revised Code to revise the Oil and Gas Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To revise the Oil and Gas Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-24 - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-15 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-15 - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-15 - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-15 - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-15 - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-30 Effective Date
2010-03-31 Governor' Action
2010-04-10 End of 10-day period
2010-03-30 Sent to Governor
2010-03-24 Concurrence
2009-12-15 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2009-12-09 Committee Report - S
2009-09-01 To Environment & Natural Resources
2009-09-01 Introduced to House
2010-03-24 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2010-03-11 Committee Report - S
2009-12-16 To Agriculture & Natural Resources
2009-12-16 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15Amended CodeCitation Text
1509Amended CodeCitation Text
150901Amended CodeCitation Text
150902Amended CodeCitation Text
1509021New CodeSee Bill Text
150903Amended CodeCitation Text
150904Amended CodeCitation Text
1509041New CodeSee Bill Text
150905Amended CodeCitation Text
150906Amended CodeCitation Text
1509062New CodeSee Bill Text
150907Amended CodeCitation Text
1509071Amended CodeCitation Text
1509072Amended CodeCitation Text
1509073New CodeSee Bill Text
150910Amended CodeCitation Text
150911Amended CodeCitation Text
150912Amended CodeCitation Text
150913Amended CodeCitation Text
150914Amended CodeCitation Text
150917Amended CodeCitation Text
150918Amended CodeCitation Text
1509181New CodeSee Bill Text
150919New CodeSee Bill Text
150920Amended CodeCitation Text
150921Amended CodeCitation Text
150922Amended CodeCitation Text
1509221Amended CodeCitation Text
1509222Amended CodeCitation Text
1509225Amended CodeCitation Text
1509226Amended CodeCitation Text
150923Amended CodeCitation Text
150924Amended CodeCitation Text
150927Amended CodeCitation Text
150931Amended CodeCitation Text
150934New CodeSee Bill Text
150935Amended CodeCitation Text
150936Amended CodeCitation Text
150950New CodeSee Bill Text
150960New CodeSee Bill Text
150961New CodeSee Bill Text
1565Amended CodeCitation Text
156507Amended CodeCitation Text
156513Amended CodeCitation Text
1571Amended CodeCitation Text
157105Amended CodeCitation Text
157118New CodeSee Bill Text
49New CodeSee Bill Text
4929New CodeSee Bill Text
4929041New CodeSee Bill Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5703Amended CodeCitation Text
5703052Amended CodeCitation Text
570321Amended CodeCitation Text
5749Amended CodeCitation Text
574901Amended CodeCitation Text
574903Amended CodeCitation Text
574906Amended CodeCitation Text
574907Amended CodeCitation Text
574908Amended CodeCitation Text
574910Amended CodeCitation Text
574912Amended CodeCitation Text
574913Amended CodeCitation Text
574914Amended CodeCitation Text
574915Amended CodeCitation Text
574917Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback