OH SB161 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 4513.19 of the Revised Code to require motor vehicle headlights to comply with the headlamp color requirements contained in Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standard number 108.
Title
To require motor vehicle headlights to comply with the headlamp color requirements contained in Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standard number 108.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Governor' Action | |
2014-04-12 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-04-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-03-19 | Concurrence | |
2013-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-20 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-07-24 | To Transportation | |
2013-07-24 | Introduced to House | |
2014-03-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-02-26 | Committee Report | |
2013-12-10 | To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2013-12-10 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 13 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |