OH SB148 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 69-42)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 69-42)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 5533.324 of the Revised Code to designate a portion of Interstate 271 in Bedford Heights as the "Army Pvt. Brandon Sloan Memorial Highway."
Title
To designate a portion of Interstate 271 in Bedford Heights as the "Army Pvt. Brandon Sloan Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-11-20 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-29 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-12-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-11-20 | Concurrence | |
2013-11-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-13 | Committee Report | |
2013-06-25 | To Transportation | |
2013-06-25 | Introduced to House | |
2014-11-20 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-02-12 | Committee Report | |
2013-11-20 | To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2013-11-20 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
55 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 33 | 324 | New Code | See Bill Text |