OH SB122 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2151.312, 2151.354, and 2152.26, to enact new sections 2151.56, 2151.57, 2151.58, and 2151.59 and to repeal sections 2151.56, 2151.57, 2151.58, 2151.59, 2151.60, and 2151.61 of the Revised Code to ratify, enact into law, and enter into as a party the Interstate Compact for Juveniles; to provide for certain entities and officials and assign certain responsibilities that relate to that Compact; to repeal the current Interstate Compact on Juveniles, and to declare an emergency.
Title
To ratify, enact into law, and enter into as a party the Interstate Compact for Juveniles; to provide for certain entities and officials and assign certain responsibilities that relate to that Compact; to repeal the current Interstate Compact on Juveniles, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2011-06-30 | Governor' Action | |
2011-07-08 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-06-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-06-23 | Concurrence | |
2011-05-24 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-05-12 | Committee Report | |
2011-03-16 | To Judiciary Civil Justice | |
2011-03-16 | Introduced to House | |
2011-06-23 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-06-15 | Committee Report | |
2011-05-25 | To Judiciary & Ethics | |
2011-05-25 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 51 | 312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 51 | 354 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 51 | 56 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
21 | 51 | 57 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
21 | 51 | 58 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
21 | 51 | 59 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
21 | 51 | 60 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
21 | 51 | 61 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
21 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 52 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |