OH SB106 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2101.16, 2107.76, 2109.21, 2111.05, 2111.18, 2125.04, 2305.19, 5747.01, and 5815.31 of the Revised Code to exclude from the application of the savings statute certain estate and trust proceedings that have limitation periods, to raise the threshold amount for the termination or avoidance of guardianships of small estates of wards, to raise the threshold amount for the avoidance of guardianship upon the settlement of claims of minors or adult incompetents, to clarify that termination of marriage revokes any trust provision conferring a beneficial interest on the former spouse, to modify the period within which a plaintiff in a wrongful death action may commence a new action after the reversal of a judgment for the plaintiff or the plaintiff's failure otherwise than upon the merits, and to modify the residency qualifications for a person's appointment as a guardian.
Title
To exclude from the application of the savings statute certain estate and trust proceedings that have limitation periods, to raise the threshold amount for the termination or avoidance of guardianships of small estates of wards, to raise the threshold amount for the avoidance of guardianship upon the settlement of claims of minors or adult incompetents, to clarify that termination of marriage revokes any trust provision conferring a beneficial interest on the former spouse, to modify the period within which a plaintiff in a wrongful death action may commence a new action after the reversal of a judgment for the plaintiff or the plaintiff's failure otherwise than upon the merits, and to modify the residency qualifications for a person's appointment as a guardian.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2009-12-15 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-08 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-08 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Effective Date | |
2009-12-23 | Governor' Action | |
2009-12-29 | End of 10-day period | |
2009-12-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-12-15 | Concurrence | |
2009-06-25 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-06-18 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-04-09 | To Judiciary Civil Justice | |
2009-04-09 | Introduced to House | |
2009-12-08 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2009-11-18 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-06-29 | To Civil & Commercial Law | |
2009-06-29 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 01 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 07 | 76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 09 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 11 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 11 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 25 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 05 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
58 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
58 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
58 | 15 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |