OH HCR41 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 38-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - To Reference
Pending: Senate Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - To Reference
Pending: Senate Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To condemn Section 1021 of the National Defense
Title
To condemn Section 1021 of the National Defense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House - Resolution was adopted (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | To Reference | |
2014-03-13 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-03-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-01-15 | Committee Report | |
2013-11-19 | To Military and Veterans Affairs | |
2013-11-19 | Introduced to House |