OH HCR27 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 59-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To urge the Internal Revenue Service to correct its policy of targeting tax-exempt status applications for additional review based on the applicant organization's presumed political affiliation.
Title
To urge the Internal Revenue Service to correct its policy of targeting tax-exempt status applications for additional review based on the applicant organization's presumed political affiliation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - House - House - Resolution was adopted (Vote) (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-16 - House - House - Resolution was adopted (Vote) (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | Concurrence | |
2014-05-07 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-04-10 | Committee Report | |
2013-10-17 | To Ways & Means | |
2013-10-17 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-10-16 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-09-30 | Committee Report | |
2013-05-28 | To Policy and Legislative Oversight | |
2013-05-28 | Introduced to House |