OH HB98 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 82-42)
Status: Passed on November 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 82-42)
Status: Passed on November 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 4506.09, 4713.60, 4723.24, 4725.16, 4725.51, 4732.14, 4733.15, 4743.04, 5903.10, 5903.12, and 5903.121 and to enact section 5903.03 of the Revised Code to revise the Occupational Licensing Law regarding military service members and veterans and to declare an emergency.
Title
To revise the Occupational Licensing Law regarding military service members and veterans and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-06 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House - Passed as emergency measure (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House - Emergency clause stood (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House - Passed as emergency measure (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House - Emergency clause stood (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-15 | Effective Date | |
2013-11-15 | Governor' Action | |
2013-11-26 | End of 10-day period | |
2013-11-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2013-11-06 | Concurrence | |
2013-11-06 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-11-06 | Committee Report* | |
2013-05-23 | To *Rules | |
2013-05-23 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-05-22 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-05-22 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-03-07 | To Military and Veterans Affairs | |
2013-03-07 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 06 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 13 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 23 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 25 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 25 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 32 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 33 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 43 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
59 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
59 | 03 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 03 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 03 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 03 | 121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |