OH HB85 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 75-41)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 75-41)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 323.151, 323.152, 323.153, 4503.064, 4503.065, and 4503.066 of the Revised Code to enhance the homestead exemption for military veterans who are 100% disabled from a service-connected disability.
Title
To enhance the homestead exemption for military veterans who are 100% disabled from a service-connected disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-12 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-21 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-03 | Concurrence | |
2014-05-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-20 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-03-20 | To Finance | |
2014-03-20 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-03-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-03-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-02-26 | To Finance and Appropriations | |
2013-02-26 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
3 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 23 | 151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 23 | 152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 23 | 153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 03 | 064 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 03 | 065 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 03 | 066 | Amended Code | Citation Text |